US HB219 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-200. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-200. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Swan Lake Hydroelectric Project Boundary Correction Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior, after consulting with the U.S. Forest Service, to modify the boundary of the Swan Lake Hydroelectric Project (FERC No. 2911) in southeast Alaska and to convey any additional land necessary for the project to the State of Alaska.
Title
Swan Lake Hydroelectric Project Boundary Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-200. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4809, text: CR S4809) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 306. |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR (2/5/2018) H761) |
2018-02-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H896) |
2018-02-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Young (AK) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 219. |
2018-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H761-762) |
2018-02-05 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397. |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-532. |
2018-01-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-10-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB267 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources