US HB2189 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Digital Coast Act This bill provides statutory authority for and revises the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration's (NOAA's) Digital Coast program. (The program currently exists under NOAA to provide data, tools, and training that communities use to manage their coastal resources.) NOAA must focus on filling data needs and gaps for critical coastal management issues and support continued improvement in existing efforts to coordinate the acquisition and integration of key data sets needed for coastal management. NOAA may enter into financial agreements and collect fees to carry out the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital Coast Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
2019-11-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-315.
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-05-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1069 (Same As) 2019-11-13 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback