US HB2189 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Death in Custody Reporting Act of 2011 - Requires states that receive certain criminal justice assistance grants to report to the Attorney General on a quarterly basis certain information regarding the death of any person who is detained, under arrest, in the process of being arrested, en route to incarceration, or incarcerated at a municipal or county jail, state prison, state-run or contracted boot camp prison, state or local contract facility, or other local or state correctional facility. Imposes penalties of up to a 10% reduction of federal Byrne Justice Assistance Grant funding, at the Attorney General's discretion, on states that fail to comply with such reporting requirements. Requires the head of each federal law enforcement agency to report to the Attorney General annually certain information regarding the death of any person who: (1) is detained, under arrest, or or in the process of being arrested by any officer of such agency (or by any state or local law enforcement officer for purposes of a federal law enforcement operation); or (2) is en route to be incarcerated or detained, or is incarcerated or detained, at any federal correctional or pre-trial detention facility located within the United States or any other facility pursuant to a contract with or used by such agency. Requires the Attorney General to study such information and report on means by which it can be used to reduce the number of such deaths.
Title
Death in Custody Reporting Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 398 N: 18 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 18 (Roll no. 713). (text: CR H6244-6245) |
2011-09-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6256-6257) |
2011-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (TX) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2011-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2189. |
2011-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6244-6246) |
2011-09-20 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 127. |
2011-09-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-198. |
2011-08-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-08-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding