US HB2189 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government Charge Card Abuse Prevention Act of 2009 - Requires each executive agency, except for the Department of Defense (DOD), to establish and maintain specified safeguards and internal controls for official purchase cards and convenience checks, including measures to ensure that: (1) records are kept of each card holder and applicable transaction limits; (2) rebates and refunds based on prompt payment, sales volume, or other agency actions on card accounts are reviewed for accuracy; (3) periodic reviews are performed to determine whether each cardholder needs a card; (4) effective systems, techniques, and technologies are used to prevent or identify fraudulent purchases; and (5) steps are taken to recover the cost of erroneous, improper, or illegal purchases made with a purchase card or convenience check through salary offsets. Establishes similar requirements for DOD. Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to review existing guidance and prescribe additional guidance governing the implementation of the safeguards and internal controls. Requires each agency head to provide for appropriate adverse personnel actions or other punishment, including dismissal, in cases where employees violate agency policies implementing the guidance or make improper, erroneous, or illegal purchases. Requires the guidance to direct each agency head with more than $10 million in purchase card spending annually and each Inspector General to jointly report to the Director on such violations semiannually. Lists actions that each agency Inspector General should take, including to conduct periodic assessments of agency purchase card or convenience check programs to identify and analyze risks of illegal, improper, or erroneous purchases and payments in order to develop a plan for periodic audits of transactions. Amends the Travel and Transportation Reform Act of 1998 to require each agency to establish safeguards and internal controls over federal contractor-issued travel charge cards to ensure the proper, efficient, and effective use of such cards. Requires agencies that have employees who use a travel charge card that is billed directly to the U.S. government to establish and maintain specified internal control activities, including requirements to: (1) compare items submitted on an employee's travel voucher with items paid for using a centrally billed account on any related travel; (2) dispute unallowable and erroneous charges and track disputed transactions to ensure appropriate resolution; and (3) submit requests to servicing airlines for refunds for fully or partially unused tickets and to track unused tickets to ensure appropriate resolution.
Title
Government Charge Card Abuse Prevention Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] |
Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Charles Djou [R-HI] | Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] |
Rep. Brad Ellsworth [D-IN] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Baron Hill [D-IN] | Rep. Peter Hoekstra [R-MI] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] |
Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Mark Souder [R-IN] |
Rep. Gene Taylor [D-MS] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. | |
2009-06-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to House Armed Services | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Related) 2009-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
SB942 (Same As) 2009-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB942 (Same As) 2009-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer credit
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government investigations
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Public contracts and procurement
Travel and tourism
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer credit
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government investigations
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Public contracts and procurement
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2189/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2189/BILLS-111hr2189ih.pdf |