US HB2182 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Plum Island Preservation Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to submit to Congress a report on alternatives for the final disposition of Plum Island, New York, including transfer to another government or nonprofit entity for education, research, or conservation purposes. This report must contain, for each alternative, an analysis of: the effect it would have on the island's resources; remediation responsibilities under it; legislation necessary to implement it; possible implications and issues of implementing it; potential costs, including costs of the transition, hazard mitigation, and cleanup of property that would be incurred by a recipient; and potential revenue. (Sec. 4) No action, including any pre-sale marketing activity, may be taken to carry out the requirement under current law for the General Services Administration to sell the property and assets that support Plum Island operations until at least 180 days after such report has been submitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plum Island Preservation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26SenateReceived in the Senate.
2017-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6239)
2017-07-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2182.
2017-07-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6239-6241)
2017-07-25HouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.
2017-04-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2017-04-26HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback