US HB216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-4)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Main Street Tax Certainty Act This bill makes permanent the tax deduction for qualified business income. (Under current law, the deduction expires after December 31, 2025.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Main Street Tax Certainty Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1149 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4947 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback