US HB216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the tax deduction for qualified business income. (Under current law, the deduction expires after December 31, 2025.)
Title
Main Street Tax Certainty Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1149 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4947 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4947 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/216/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr216/BILLS-116hr216ih.pdf |