US HB2150 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless Veterans' Reintegration Programs Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Extends through FY2018 Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) homeless veterans reintegration programs (job training, counseling, and placement services to expedite the reintegration of homeless veterans into the labor force).
Title
Homeless Veterans' Reintegration Programs Reauthorization Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Related) 2013-05-09 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2150/BILLS-113hr2150ih.pdf |