US HB2140 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing Child Marriage Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing Child Marriage Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-06-10HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4383-4384)
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2140.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4383-4385)
2019-06-10HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback