US HB2114 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing State Energy Security Planning and Emergency Preparedness Act of 2019 This bill addresses state energy security plans. The bill authorizes the Department of Energy (DOE) to provide financial assistance to states for the implementation, review, and revision of a state energy security plan that assesses the state's existing circumstances and proposes methods to strengthen the ability of the state to have a reliable, secure, and resilient energy infrastructure. A state energy security plan must contain specified content, including a risk assessment of energy infrastructure and cross-sector interdependencies and a risk mitigation approach to enhance reliability and end-use resilience. The plan must address potential hazards to each energy sector or system, including physical threats and cybersecurity threats and vulnerabilities. Upon request of a state, DOE may provide information and technical assistance, and other assistance, in the development, implementation, or revision of a state energy security plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing State Energy Security Planning and Emergency Preparedness Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
2019-10-22SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-137.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-09-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-09-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7543-7544)
2019-09-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2114.
2019-09-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7543-7544)
2019-09-09HouseMr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2094 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback