US HB211 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Chugach Region Lands Study Act This bill requires the Department of the Interior, in coordination with the Department of Agriculture, to identify at least 500,000 acres of economically viable federal land that may be exchanged with the Chugach Alaska Corporation. Acre-for-acre exchange of identified federal land for certain Chugach Alaska Corporation land is deemed to be in the public interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chugach Region Lands Study Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB1493 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback