US HB2102 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate certain subsidies for fossil-fuel production.
Title
End Polluter Welfare Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1167 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2102/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2102/BILLS-117hr2102ih.pdf |