US HB2099 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends through FY2023 payments made to states and eligible counties containing certain federal land under the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000. The Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture shall carry out a pilot program to allow the Chief of the Forest Service or the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to nominate members of resource advisory committees. County funds may be used to provide or expand access to (1) broadband telecommunications services at local schools, or (2) the technology and connectivity necessary for students to use a digital learning tool at or outside of a local school campus. Any county funds that were obligated by a county before October 1, 2017, but are unspent on October 1, 2020, may be used by the county for any authorized use and shall be available for projects initiated after October 1, 2020. No county funds may be used for lobbying activity, regardless of the purpose for which the funds are obligated on or before the enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure Rural Schools Reauthorization Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB435 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB696 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback