US HB2097 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 205-94)
Status: Passed on August 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-232.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 205-94)
Status: Passed on August 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-232.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Star-Spangled Banner Commemorative Coin Act - (Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue $5 gold coins and $1 silver coins in commemoration of the bicentennial of the writing of the Star-Spangled Banner. (Sec. 4) Requires a coin design emblematic of the War of 1812, and in particular of, the Battle for Baltimore that formed the basis for the Star-Spangled Banner. (Sec. 5) Limits the period for coin issuance to calendar year 2012. (Sec. 7) Imposes a surcharge of $35 per coin for the $5 coins and $10 per coin for the $1 coins, which shall be distributed to the Maryland War of 1812 Bicentennial Commission for the purpose of supporting bicentennial activities, educational outreach activities, and preservation and improvement activities pertaining to the sites and structures relating to the War of 1812.
Title
Star-Spangled Banner Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | Became Public Law No: 111-232. | |
2010-08-16 | Signed by President. | |
2010-08-10 | Presented to President. | |
2010-08-03 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-08-02 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-08-02 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-08-02 | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6594) | |
2009-09-10 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. | |
2009-09-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 691). (text: CR H9363-9364) | |
2009-09-09 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9388) | |
2009-09-09 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-09-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2097. | |
2009-09-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9363-9365) | |
2009-09-09 | Mr. Watt moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3564-3565)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Europe
Maryland
Military history
Music
National symbols
U.S. history
United Kingdom
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Europe
Maryland
Military history
Music
National symbols
U.S. history
United Kingdom