US HB2093 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make all fact sheets of the Department of Veterans Affairs available in English, Spanish, and Tagalog, and other commonly spoken languages, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans and Family Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-62. |
2021-11-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7685) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2773) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2093. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2773-2774) |
2021-06-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2195 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.