US HB2087 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rescinds specified funds that were provided by the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 for various programs and accounts. The bill rescinds funding that was provided for programs and accounts such as the Higher Education Emergency Relief Fund, the Child Care and Development Block Grant program, Federal Transit Administration grants, Amtrak, the Coronavirus State and Local Fiscal Recovery Funds program, several foreign assistance programs, nutrition assistance programs, relief for airports, and emergency rental assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PELOSI Rescissions Act of 2021 Proudly Eliminating Liberal Objective Spending Items Rescissions Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2021-05-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2021-05-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2021-05-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-03-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects

Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child care and development
Child health
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Corporation for National and Community Service
Corporation for Public Broadcasting
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
District of Columbia
Domestic violence and child abuse
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Family services
Federal-Indian relations
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Humanities programs funding
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International organizations and cooperation
Landlord and tenant
Libraries and archives
Minority education
Multilateral development programs
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National and community service
National Foundation on the Arts and the Humanities
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Nutrition and diet
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public transit
Railroad Retirement Board
Railroads
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sex offenses
Small business
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback