US HB208 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-33. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 West Main Street, Suite 102 in Tupelo, Mississippi, as the Colonel Carlyle "Smitty" Harris Post Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 West Main Street, Suite 102 in Tupelo, Mississippi, as the "Colonel Carlyle 'Smitty' Harris Post Office". To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 West Main Street, Suite 102 in Tupelo, Mississippi, as the Colonel Carlyle Smitty Harris Post Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 406 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-06HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-33. (TXT | PDF)
2021-08-06HouseSigned by President.
2021-08-04HousePresented to President.
2021-07-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-07-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5110; text: CR S5110)
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
2021-04-14SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
2021-03-17SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-02-24SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2021-02-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-02-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 15 (Roll no. 32). (text: CR H556)
2021-02-23HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H563-564)
2021-02-23HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-02-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 208.
2021-02-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H556-557)
2021-02-23HouseMr. Mfume moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-02-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2021-02-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-01-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback