US HB2075 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-417.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crooked River Ranch Fire Protection Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of the Interior to adjust the eastern boundary of the Deschutes Canyon-Steelhead Falls Wilderness Study Area and the Deschutes Canyon Wilderness Study Area in Oregon to exclude approximately 832 acres, as depicted on the map entitled " "Deschutes Canyon-Steelhead Falls Wilderness Study Area" dated April 6, 2017, to facilitate fire prevention and response activities on the excluded public lands and adjacent private property. The public lands to be excluded from such wilderness study areas are no longer subject to requirements under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 regarding the status of public lands during the period they are being reviewed for designation as wilderness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crooked River Ranch Fire Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-05SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-417.
2018-11-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 692.
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-08-22SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2018-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-07-11HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6067-6068)
2018-07-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2075.
2018-07-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6067-6069)
2018-07-11HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-08-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201.
2017-08-29HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-281.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-04-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback