US HB2069 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 800.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 800.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2018 This bill amends the United States Housing Act of 1937 to include within the definition of "families" a child who is in foster care and has attained an age such that the provision of foster care for such child will end by reason of the age of the child within six months. Preference is given, subject to certain terms and conditions, for public housing occupancy and section 8 housing assistance under such Act to certain otherwise eligible children who are aging out of foster care and are at-risk for homelessness. The bill amends the Housing Act of 1949 to give preference for rural rental assistance to certain otherwise eligible children who are aging out of foster care and are at-risk of homelessness.
Title
Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 800. |
2018-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1023. |
2018-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 23. |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1638 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Congressional oversight
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Rural conditions and development
Congressional oversight
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Rural conditions and development