US HB2067 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 119-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting America's Workers Act - Amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 (OSHA) to expand its coverage to federal, state, and local government employees. Authorizes the Secretary of Labor, under specified conditions, to cede OSHA jurisdiction to another federal agency with respect to certain occupational standards or regulations for such agency's employees. Declares OSHA inapplicable to working conditions covered by the Federal Mine Safety and Heath Act of 1977. Sets forth increased protections for whistle blowers under OSHA. Sets forth provisions relating to: (1) the posting of employee rights; (2) a prohibition against the adoption or implementation of policies or practices by employers that discourage the reporting of work-related injuries or illnesses or that discriminate or provide for adverse action against any employee for reporting such injury or illness; (3) a prohibition against the loss of wages or employee benefits as a result of an employee participating in or aiding workplace inspections; (4) investigations of incidents in a place of employment resulting in a death or the hospitalization of two or more employees; (5) a prohibition against designating a citation for an occupational health and safety standard violation as an unclassified citation; (6) the rights of an employee who has sustained a work-related injury or illness that is the subject of an investigation; (7) an employer's right to contest citations and penalties; (8) the Secretary's assertion of an employer's failure to correct a serious hazard during an employer's contest to a citation; and (9) employee objections to modifications of citations. Increases civil and criminal penalties for certain OSHA violators. Requires a state that has an approved plan for the development and enforcement of occupational safety and health standards to amend its plan to conform to the requirements of this Act within 12 months after enactment of this Act.
Title
Protecting America's Workers Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2010-03-16 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1580 (Same As) 2009-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Labor
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Labor and employment
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Labor
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Labor and employment
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2067/BILLS-111hr2067ih.pdf |