US HB2063 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid PACE Act of 2017 Opioid Preventing Abuse through Continuing Education Act of 2017 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to require a practitioner (other than a hospital, pharmacy, pharmacist, or veterinarian) to comply with a training requirement, as a condition of obtaining or renewing a registration to prescribe or dispense opioids for the treatment of pain or pain management.
Title
Opioid PACE Act of 2017 Opioid Preventing Abuse through Continuing Education Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4075 (Related) 2017-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health personnel
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Prescription drugs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health personnel
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2063/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2063/BILLS-115hr2063ih.pdf |