US HB2053 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mining Schools Enhancement Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to require the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement (OSMRE) of the Department of the Interior to ensure that at least 70% of specified research funds are expended to enhance and support programs at mining and mineral engineering schools in the United States. In addition, OSMRE shall ensure that research activities relate to conventional fuel resource development and production, including enhancing technologies and practices related to the mitigation of acid mine drainage, reforestation, and revegetation in the reclamation of land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining.
Title
Mining Schools Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186. |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-256. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Education programs funding
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Science and engineering education
Education programs funding
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Science and engineering education