US HB2045 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Veterans Economic Opportunity and Transition Administration to administer economic opportunity assistance programs for veterans and their dependents and survivors. Specifically, the Veterans Economic Opportunity and Transition Administration must administer the following Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) programs: vocational rehabilitation and employment programs, educational assistance programs, veterans' housing loan and related programs, the Transition Assistance Program, and the database of small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans. Prior to the transfer of administrative responsibilities, the bill requires the VA to certify that (1) the transition of the provision of services will not negatively affect the provision of such services to veterans, and (2) such services are ready to be transferred.
Title
VET OPP Act Veterans’ Education, Transition, and Opportunity Prioritization Plan Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4045-4046) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2045. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4045-4048) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 45. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-69. |
2019-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1003 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs