US HB2044 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Smart Building Acceleration Act This bill assists the building sector in adopting smart building technology that increases energy efficiency. Smart buildings are buildings with energy systems that (1) are flexible and automated; (2) have extensive operational monitoring and communication connectivity, allowing remote monitoring and analysis of building functions; (3) take a systems-based approach in integrating the overall building operations for control of energy generation, consumption, and storage; (4) communicate with utilities and other third-party commercial entities, if appropriate; (5) protect the health and safety of occupants and workers; and (6) are cybersecure. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a Federal Smart Building Program. Under the program, DOE must implement smart building technology in certain federal buildings and demonstrate the costs and benefits of smart buildings. DOE may expand awards made under the Federal Energy Management Program and the Better Building Challenge to recognize specific federal agency achievements in accelerating the adoption of smart building technologies. In addition, DOE must conduct (1) a survey of privately owned smart buildings throughout the United States and evaluate their costs and benefits, and (2) research and development on barriers to the integration of advanced building technologies. As part of the Better Building Challenge, DOE must demonstrate policies and approaches that accelerate the transition to smart buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smart Building Acceleration Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2335 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback