US HB2041 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Weatherization Enhancement and Local Energy Efficiency Investment and Accountability Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weatherization Enhancement and Local Energy Efficiency Investment and Accountability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB983 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback