US HB2030 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-12)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act This bill requires the Department of the Interior to carry out the Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan which was submitted to Congress on March 19, 2019, by Arizona, California, Colorado, Nevada, New Mexico, Utah, and Wyoming. Interior must execute the plan without delay and operate applicable Colorado River System reservoirs accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)
2019-04-16SenateSigned by President.
2019-04-10SenatePresented to President.
2019-04-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2298)
2019-04-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3112)
2019-04-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2030.
2019-04-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3112-3115)
2019-04-08HouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1057 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback