US HB2020 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for an online repository for certain reporting requirements for recipients of Federal disaster assistance, and for other purposes.
Title
Post-Disaster Assistance Online Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 412 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 2 (Roll no. 258). (text: CR H5456-5457) |
2022-06-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5469-5470) |
2022-06-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2020. |
2022-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5456-5458) |
2022-06-13 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-06-13 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2022-06-13 | House | Committee on Small Business discharged. |
2022-06-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 275. |
2022-06-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-363, Part I. |
2022-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |