US HB2019 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish and carry out a smart energy and water efficiency management pilot program. Under the program, DOE must award grants to water authorities (i.e., authorities that provide water, wastewater, or water reuse services) for demonstrating advanced and innovative technology-based solutions that will increase and improve the energy efficiency of water, wastewater, and water reuse systems; support the implementation of innovative processes and the installation of advanced automated systems that provide real-time data on energy and water; and improve energy and water conservation, water quality, and predictive maintenance of energy and water systems, through the use of Internet-connected technologies.
Title
Smart Energy and Water Efficiency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2665 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2799 (Related) 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2799 (Related) 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Computers and information technology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water resources development
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2019/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2019/BILLS-116hr2019ih.pdf |