US HB2015 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRACED Act Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act This bill implements a forfeiture penalty for violations (with or without intent) of the prohibition on certain robocalls. The bill also removes an annual reporting requirement for enforcement relating to unsolicited facsimile advertisements. The bill requires voice service providers to develop call authentication technologies. The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) shall promulgate rules establishing when a provider may block a voice call based on information provided by the call authentication framework, but also must establish a process to permit a calling party adversely affected by the framework to verify the authenticity of their calls. The FCC shall also initiate a rulemaking to help protect a subscriber from receiving unwanted calls or texts from a caller using an unauthenticated number. This bill requires the Department of Justice and the FCC to assemble an interagency working group to study and report to Congress on the enforcement of the prohibition of certain robocalls. Specifically, the working group will look into how to better enforce against robocalls by examining issues like the types of laws, policies, or constraints that could be inhibiting enforcement. The bill requires the FCC to initiate a proceeding to determine whether its policies regarding access to number resources could be modified to help reduce access to numbers by potential robocall violators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRACED Act Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1602 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB721 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB151 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback