US HB1992 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to establish programs for carbon dioxide capture, transport, utilization, and storage, and for other purposes.
Title
SCALE Act Storing CO2 and Lowering Emissions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB799 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2377 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2377 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1992/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1992/BILLS-117hr1992ih.pdf |