US HB1991 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Act Extension Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill extends the authority of the Department of the Interior, with respect to federal land management agencies, and the Department of Agriculture, with respect to the Forest Service, to carry out the Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Act through September 30, 2017.
Title
Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Act Extension Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109. |
2015-06-12 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2015-06-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-151, Part I. |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-04-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees