US HB1983 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides support for the conservation of western monarch butterflies (the monarch butterfly population that overwinters along the coast of California and breeds across California, Arizona, Nevada, Washington, Oregon, Idaho, and Utah). Specifically, the bill establishes the Western Monarch Butterfly Rescue Fund. The Department of the Interior must use amounts in the fund to provide grants for the conservation of such butterflies. In addition, Interior must enter into an agreement with the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation to facilitate the implementation of the Western Monarch Butterfly Conservation Plan, which was prepared by the Western Association of Fish and Wildlife Agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MONARCH Act of 2021 Monarch Action, Recovery, and Conservation of Habitat Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-29HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-05-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2021-05-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB809 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback