US HB1966 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-9)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-9)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Accountability Office to complete a study reviewing how federal agencies address barriers to participation in federally-funded cancer clinical trials by individuals from underrepresented populations and provide recommendations for addressing such barriers.
Title
Henrietta Lacks Enhancing Cancer Research Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-291. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7829) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7086) |
2020-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1966. |
2020-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7086-7088) |
2020-12-09 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-02 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Mfume asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1966, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Medical research
Minority health
Public participation and lobbying
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Medical research
Minority health
Public participation and lobbying