US HB1964 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Air Traffic Controllers Hiring Act of 2015 Directs the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA), in appointing individuals to the position of air traffic controller, to give preference to: an individual who has successfully completed air traffic controller training and graduated from an institution participating in the Collegiate Training Initiative program (the program) and who has received from the institution either an appropriate recommendation or an endorsement certifying that the individual would have met the requirements in effect as of December 31, 2013, for an appropriate recommendation; a qualified individual who is eligible for a veterans recruitment appointment; a qualified individual who is an eligible veteran maintaining aviation experience obtained in the course of the individual's military experience; a preference eligible veteran; and a qualified individual maintaining practical air traffic control experience obtained at civilian installations of the Department of Defense, FAA air traffic control facilities, or contract towers of the FAA. Allows the FAA to consider additional applicants only after completing consideration of such preferred applicants. Provides that a preferred applicant shall not be subject to any biographical assessment as part of FAA hiring practices that apply to applicants for the position of air traffic controller. Directs the FAA to revise its hiring practices to eliminate the use of any biographical assessment that unduly disqualifies applicants. Provides for reconsideration of individuals who applied in response to the FG-01 vacancy announcement of February 10, 2014, who were disqualified on the basis of such an assessment. Requires (currently, allows) the FAA to maintain the program by making new agreements and continuing existing agreements with institutions of higher education under which the institutions prepare students for the position of air traffic controller. Directs the FAA to take into consideration any training initiatives for air traffic controllers that are locally developed at institutions of higher education participating in the program for use in establishing best practices nationwide.
Title
Air Traffic Controllers Hiring Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1964/BILLS-114hr1964ih.pdf |