US HB1957 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide coverage for infertility treatment and standard fertility preservation services, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Infertility Treatment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-06-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1957/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1957/BILLS-117hr1957ih.pdf |