US HB1931 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes domestic terrorism offices in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), the Department of Justice (DOJ), and the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) and requires specified steps to prevent and report on domestic terrorism. The bill also authorizes a Domestic Terrorism Executive Committee, which shall coordinate with key public safety officials to promote information sharing and ensure an effective joint effort to combat domestic terrorism. The joint terrorism task forces of the FBI and state, local, and regional fusion centers shall each, in coordination with the committee and such offices (1) share intelligence to address domestic terrorism activities; (2) conduct an annual, intelligence-based assessment of domestic terrorism activities in their jurisdictions; and (3) formulate and execute a plan to address and combat such activities. DOJ, the FBI, DHS, and the Department of Defense shall establish an interagency task force to combat white supremacist and neo-Nazi infiltration of the uniformed services.
Title
Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB894 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2046-2048)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Hate crimes
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Hate crimes
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1931/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1931/BILLS-116hr1931ih.pdf |