US HB1921 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Federal Ocean Acidification Research and Monitoring Act of 2009. The bill authorizes a federal agency with a representative serving on the Interagency Working Group on Ocean Acidification to carry out a program that awards prizes competitively for innovative efforts to research or respond to ocean acidification. Priority must be given to establishing programs that address communities, environments, or industries that are in distress due to the impacts of ocean acidification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 241 (Y: 395 N: 22 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 22 (Roll no. 241). (text: CR H4327)
2019-06-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4331-4331)
2019-06-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House continued debate on H.R. 1921.
2019-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1921.
2019-06-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4327-4329)
2019-06-05HouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-04-09HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-04-09HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback