US HB1918 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-335.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-335.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill directs the President to instruct the U.S. Executive Director at each international financial institution to use U.S. influence to oppose any loan for the government of Nicaragua's benefit, other than for basic human needs or to promote democracy, unless the Department of State certifies that Nicaragua is taking effective steps to: hold free elections overseen by credible domestic and international electoral observers; promote democracy and an independent judicial system and electoral council; strengthen the rule of law; respect the right to freedom of association and expression; combat corruption, including investigating and prosecuting corrupt government officials; and protect the right of political opposition parties, journalists, trade unionists, human rights defenders, and other civil society activists to operate without interference. The Department of the Treasury shall submit to Congress a report assessing: (1) the effectiveness of the international financial institutions in enforcing applicable program safeguards in Nicaragua, and (2) the effects of specified constitutional and election concerns in Nicaragua on long-term prospects for positive development outcomes there. The President may waive such requirements in the U.S. national interest. (Sec. 5) The bill requires: (1) the President to direct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the Organization of American States to use U.S. influence to advocate for an Electoral Observation Mission to be sent to Nicaragua in 2017, and (2) the State Department to report on the involvement of senior Nicaraguan government officials in acts of public corruption or human rights violations.
Title
Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-335. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10077-10078) |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Mr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10077-10078) |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S7143-7144; text: CR S7143-7144) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7143-7144) |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-10-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7700-7702) |
2017-10-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1918. |
2017-10-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7700-7704) |
2017-10-03 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB972 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2265 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2265 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status