US HB1912 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes additional requirements for Department of Homeland Security (DHS) acquisitions that are estimated to require total expenditures of at least $300 million. These requirements include meeting certain criteria for acquisition documentation, such as validated operational requirements; preparing cost estimates and schedules in a manner consistent with best practices identified by the Government Accountability Office; and an annual comprehensive report on the status of DHS acquisitions.
Title
DHS Acquisition Documentation Integrity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3759-3760) |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1912. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3759-3761) |
2019-05-14 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement