US HB1911 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SFC Brian Woods Gold Star and Military Survivors Act This bill expands benefits for survivors of members of the Armed Forces. Specifically, it provides commissary and exchange privileges to a remarried former spouse; provides continued eligibility for payment of an annuity to a spouse who remarries, including a surviving spouse who remarried before the age of 55 and before enactment of this bill; allows payment of necessary expenses for the transportation of a decedent's remains to two locations (if the second is a national cemetery); allows payment of financial assistance to civilian providers of child care or youth program services furnished to survivors of members who die in the line of duty while on active duty, active duty for training, or inactive duty for training; and provides continued eligibility of a remarried surviving spouse for payment of veterans' dependency and indemnity compensation, including a surviving spouse who remarried before the age of 57 and before enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SFC Brian Woods Gold Star and Military Survivors Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback