US HB1911 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands benefits for survivors of members of the Armed Forces. Specifically, it provides commissary and exchange privileges to a remarried former spouse; provides continued eligibility for payment of an annuity to a spouse who remarries, including a surviving spouse who remarried before the age of 55 and before enactment of this bill; allows payment of necessary expenses for the transportation of a decedent's remains to two locations (if the second is a national cemetery); allows payment of financial assistance to civilian providers of child care or youth program services furnished to survivors of members who die in the line of duty while on active duty, active duty for training, or inactive duty for training; and provides continued eligibility of a remarried surviving spouse for payment of veterans' dependency and indemnity compensation, including a surviving spouse who remarried before the age of 57 and before enactment of this bill.
Title
SFC Brian Woods Gold Star and Military Survivors Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Child care and development
Family services
Marriage and family status
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Retail and wholesale trades
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cemeteries and funerals
Child care and development
Family services
Marriage and family status
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Retail and wholesale trades
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1911/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1911/BILLS-116hr1911ih.pdf |