US HB1907 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Communication with Consumers During Food Recall Act of 2009 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to include among prohibited acts the failure to comply with an order regarding the recall of food. Sets forth provisions governing any voluntary or mandatory recall of adulterated or misbranded food that could result in illness or injury if consumed. Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to require any food retailer: (1) to inform the Secretary regarding whether the retailer has a system for identifying persons who purchased the food; and (2) if so, to issue a recall notice to those persons. Requires the notice to be made in such manner and to contain such information as the Secretary may require and to be issued by the retailer or by a third party selected by the retailer. Directs the Secretary, upon requiring a retailer to issue a recall notice for food, to: (1) identify the manufacturers, importers, distributors, or other persons that most likely caused the adulteration or misbranding; and (2) require such persons to reimburse the retailer for any costs incurred to comply with an order issued under this Act.
Title
Improving Communication with Consumers During Food Recall Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Castle [R-DE] | Rep. Jane Harman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB841 (Related) 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3114 (Related) 2010-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3114 (Related) 2010-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Business records
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1907/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1907/BILLS-111hr1907ih.pdf |