US HB1904 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Access to Radiology Care Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to revise physician supervision requirements under the Medicare program for radiology services performed by advanced level radiographers. Specifically, with respect to a state that has established such requirements for those services, the bill aligns Medicare's requirements with state requirements. An "advanced level radiographer" is a radiographer who has obtained specified certification from either the American Registry of Radiologic Technologists or the Certification Board for Radiology Practitioner Assistants.
Title
Medicare Access to Radiology Care Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB769 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Radiation
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Radiation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1904/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1904/BILLS-115hr1904ih.pdf |