US HB1901 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To close loopholes in the immigration laws that serve as incentives to aliens to attempt to enter the United States unlawfully, and for other purposes.
Title
Stopping Border Surges Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1514) |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB884 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1958 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB7452 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1958 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB7452 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1901/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1901/BILLS-117hr1901ih.pdf |