US HB1863 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of Defense to provide blood testing for firefighters of the Department of Defense to determine potential exposure to perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Secretary of Defense to provide blood testing for firefighters of the Department of Defense to determine potential exposure to perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB858 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback