US HB1854 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug Monitoring Act of 2017 This bill requires a state that receives grant funds under the prescription drug monitoring program (PDMP) or the controlled substance monitoring program to comply with specified requirements, including a requirement to share its PDMP data with other states. The Department of Justice (DOJ) or Department of Health and Human Services may withhold grant funds from a state that fails to comply. To facilitate data sharing among states, the bill directs DOJ to award a grant under the Comprehensive Opioid Abuse Grant Program to establish and maintain a data-sharing hub.
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB778 (Same As) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1854/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1854/BILLS-115hr1854ih.pdf |