US HB1851 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Federal cost share percentage for the Milk River Project in the State of Montana.
Title
St. Mary's Reinvestment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1851/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1851/BILLS-117hr1851ih.pdf |