US HB1850 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of the Army to award the Army Combat Action Badge to any member of the Army who participated in combat during which the person actually engaged, or was personally engaged by, the enemy at any time between December 7, 1941, and September 18, 2001, as long as such person has not been previously recognized for such participation.
Title
To expand retroactive eligibility of the Army Combat Action Badge to include members of the Army who participated in combat during which they personally engaged, or were personally engaged by, the enemy at any time on or after December 7, 1941.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1850/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1850/BILLS-112hr1850ih.pdf |