US HB1843 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 182-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate the expedited review of COVID-19 hate crimes, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID–19 Hate Crimes Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E235-236) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB728 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB937 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-13.
SB963 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
SB937 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-13.
SB963 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1843/BILLS-117hr1843ih.pdf |