US HB1842 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding Entrepreneurship Act of 2009 - Amends the Small Business Act relating to small business entrepreneurial development programs (programs) to direct the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to: (1) develop and submit to Congress a plan for using the programs as a catalyst for job creation for FY2010-FY2011; (2) promulgate a rule to develop and implement a data collection process covering all programs; (3) report to Congress on opportunities to foster coordination, limit duplication, and improve delivery under the programs; (3) after public comment, establish and make available a database of providers of entrepreneurial development services; (4) designate at least one staff member in each SBA district office as a community specialist with full-time responsibility working with such providers to increase coordination with federal resources; and (5) publish a design for a Web-based portal that provides comprehensive information on the programs and, after public comment, establish such portal. Prohibits the Administrator from conducting any pilot program for a period of more than three years if the pilot program conflicts with or uses the resources of any of the entrepreneurial development programs.
Title
Expanding Entrepreneurship Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-19 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. | |
2009-11-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H13079-13080) | |
2009-11-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1842. | |
2009-11-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13079-13081) | |
2009-11-18 | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-05-13 | Provisions of Measure incorporated into H.R. 2352. | |
2009-04-30 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-04-30 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade. | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2352 (Related) 2009-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Small business
Commerce
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Small business